MS SB2896 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-33-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make A Technical Correction To The Short Title Of The Fantasy Contest Act; To Amend Section 97-33-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions; To Amend Section 97-33-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Requirements That Apply To Fantasy Contests; To Amend Section 97-33-307, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Licensure Of Fantasy Contest Operators; To Amend Section 97-33-309, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Penalties That Apply To Violations Of The Act; To Amend Section 97-33-311, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 97-33-313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Disciplinary Action; To Amend Section 97-33-315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Investigative And Administrative Authority Of The Gaming Commission; To Create New Code Section 97-33-317, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Impose A Fee On Fantasy Contest Operators Who Offer Fantasy Contests In This State; To Amend Sections 75-76-5 And 75-76-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fantasy Sports Contests; revise licensure of operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Gaming |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |