MS SB2890 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Office Of State Aid Road Construction Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation For Fiscal Year 2017.
Title
Appropriation; Transportation, Department of - State Aid Road Construction, Office of.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-18 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-18 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-17 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2016-04-17 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-16 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-14 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Busby |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Simmons (13th),DeBar |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-04-06 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-04-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Huddleston (15th), Frierson) |
2016-03-31 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-31 | House | Amended |
2016-03-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |