MS SB2877 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 43-19-33, 93-9-9 And 93-9-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Affirmation Of Paternity Of A Dependent Child Can Be Established By Declaration With A Court Of Competent Jurisdiction; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Paternity; authorize written declaration to establish.
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Doty [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-27 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Watson,Hood |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Doty,Branning,Boyd |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |