MS SB2874 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-20-102, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions Pertaining To Guardianships And Conservatorships; To Amend Section 93-20-104, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Jurisdiction Under The Act When Proceedings May Be Instituted Or Ongoing In A Different Court; To Amend Section 93-20-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Required Giving Of Notice And Summons Under The Act; To Amend Sections 93-20-107 And 93-20-108, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Combining Proceedings And Letters Of Guardianship And Conservatorship When The Guardian And Conservator Are The Same Person And To Require Subscription To An Oath By A Fiduciary; To Amend Section 93-20-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Requirements Regarding Notice And Summons; To Amend Section 93-20-116, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Internal References; To Amend Section 93-20-118, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Payment Of Attorney's Fees In Cases Where A Petition Is Filed In Bad Faith; To Amend Section 93-20-125, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Transition And Conflict Of Law Provisions; To Amend Section 93-20-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Court To Dispense With Legal Representation If That Would Impose An Undue Burden On The Ward's Estate; To Amend Section 93-20-202, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Parties Given Notice Of A Petition For Appointment Of A Guardian Of A Minor; To Amend Section 93-20-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Notice And Summons; To Amend Section 93-20-206, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Hearing Required Before Appointment Of A Guardian For A Minor And Notice Of Subsequent Proceedings; To Amend Section 93-20-207, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Notice And Summons; To Amend Section 93-20-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Powers Granted To A Guardian Of An Adult; To Amend Section 93-20-302, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Court To Dispense With Legal Representation If That Would Impose An Undue Burden On The Ward's Estate; To Amend Section 93-20-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Hearing Required Before Appointment Of A Guardian For An Adult And Notice Of Subsequent Proceedings; To Amend Section 93-20-306, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Respondent's Rights At A Hearing On A Petition To Appoint A Guardian For An Adult; To Amend Section 93-20-309, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Necessity Of Summons Given To An Adult Respondent; To Amend Section 93-20-310, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Internal References; To Amend Section 93-20-311, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Necessity Of Summons Issued For The Continuation Of An Emergency Guardianship Of An Adult; To Amend Section 93-20-403, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Hearing Required Before Appointment Of A Conservator And Notice Of Subsequent Proceedings; To Amend Section 93-20-405, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Appointment And Role Of A Guardian Ad Litem; To Amend Section 93-20-407, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify When Professional Examination Of A Minor Is Required Before Appointment Of A Conservator; To Amend Section 93-20-408, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Respondent's Rights At A Hearing On A Petition To Appoint A Conservator; To Amend Section 93-20-411, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify When Costs Are Not To Be Assessed To The Petitioner And To Make A Technical Correction; To Amend Section 93-20-413, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That Summons Must Issue For The Continuation Of A Conservatorship; To Amend Section 93-20-431, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Relating To Payment Of Settlement Proceeds Without Appointment Of A Conservator; To Repeal As Duplicative Sections 93-14-401, 92-14-402 And 93-14-403, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Constitute Article 4 Of The Uniform Adult Guardianship And Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act And Deal With The Registration And Recognition Of Foreign Orders Of Guardianship And Conservatorship; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Guardianships and conservatorships; revise GAP Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-11 | House | Passed |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |