MS SB2874 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi State Board Of Massage Therapy, For Fiscal Year 2016.
Title
Appropriation; Massage Therapy, Board of.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Phillip Gandy [R] | Sen. John Horhn [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed |
2015-03-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |