MS SB2868 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning For The Support And Maintenance Of Financial Aid Scholarship, Loan And Grant Programs And The Mississippi Office Of Student Financial Aid, For Fiscal Year 2017.
Title
Appropriation; IHL - Student Financial Aid.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Gary Jackson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-17 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-17 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-16 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-14 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Beckett |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,McDaniel |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-04-06 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-04-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Huddleston (15th), Frierson) |
2016-03-31 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-31 | House | Amended |
2016-03-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |