MS SB2864 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-159-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove Requirement That The State Department Of Education Administer The Mississippi Employer-assisted Housing Teacher Program In Conjunction With The Federal National Mortgage Association; To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On This Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Employer-Assisted Housing Teacher Program; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Education |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Education |