MS SB2863 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That Self-assessment Reports Of Depository Financial Institutions Are Privileged And Not Admissible In Any Legal Or Investigative Action In Any Civil Or Administrative Proceeding, And Are Not Subject To Any Discovery Pursuant To The Rules Of Civil Procedure Or Administrative Procedure; To Provide Exceptions To The Self-assessment Privilege; To Provide That All Reports That Are Protected By The Self-assessment Privilege Shall Be Exempt From The Public Records Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Banks; self-assessment reports are privileged and not admissible in civil or administrative proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Died On Calendar | |
2012-04-04 | Read the Third Time | |
2012-03-28 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-28 | DR - TSDPAA: JA To BB | |
2012-03-27 | DR - TSDPAA: BB To JA | |
2012-03-21 | Referred To Banking and Financial Services;Judiciary A | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-14 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-03-02 | DR - TSDPCS: JA To BF | |
2012-02-27 | DR - TSDPCS: BF To JA | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions;Judiciary, Division A |