MS SB2857 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide A Penalty For Willfully Discharging A Firearm Toward The Dwelling Of Another And Causing Damage To The Dwelling Or Domesticated Animals Or Livestock; To Require The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Develop A Safety Program For Hiking, Horseback Riding And Walking Trails In Wildlife Management Areas; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hunting; require safety program for use of trails in wildlife management areas during gun season.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Eaton,Parker,Cockerham | |
2010-03-16 | Conferees Named Gollott,Lee (47th),Hudson | |
2010-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-11 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed | |
2010-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |