MS SB2853 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Saltillo, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Generating Revenue To Enhance Tourism And Parks And Recreation; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Saltillo; authorize the governing authorities to impose a tax on hotels, motels and restaurants for certain purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Approved by Governor
2019-03-19HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-18HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-14HousePassed
2019-03-12HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation
2019-02-26SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-25SenatePassed
2019-02-25SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-20SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Local and Private

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback