MS SB2851 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Eliminate The 3-day Waiting Period For A Marriage License And To Delete The Requirement For A Blood Test For Syphilis; To Repeal Section 93-1-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Right To Contest The Issuance Of A Marriage License By Any Interested Party; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Marriage license; eliminate 3-day waiting period and blood test.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-04-05 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Upshaw, Baker, Reynolds) | |
2012-04-04 | Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2012-03-14 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-13 | Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |