MS SB2849 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Establishment Of Regional Recycling Centers At Regional Correctional Facilities; To Amend Section 17-17-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Local Governments Solid Waste Assistance Fund May Be Used To Assist In The Establishment Of Regional Recycling Centers; To Amend Section 49-31-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Multimedia Pollution Prevention Program Of The Department Of Environmental Quality May Provide Assistance For Such Regional Recycling Centers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Recycling; local governments may establish recycling centers at regional correctional facilities and authorize DEQ to assist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-26 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Passed | |
2010-02-18 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources | |
2010-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-08 | Passed | |
2010-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Environment Prot, Cons and Water Res |