MS SB2844 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 25-15-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Local Governing Authorities To Pay All Or Part Of The Costs Of Additional Insurance Coverage For Dependents Of Their Employees; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local governmental entities; authorize to pay costs of insurance coverage for dependents of employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateDied In Conference
2019-03-25HouseConferees Named Byrd,Reynolds,Bennett
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Parks
2019-03-21SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-05HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-04HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-04HouseAmended
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Insurance
2019-02-07SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-06SenatePassed
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback