MS SB2839 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 35-1-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The State Veterans Affairs Board May Also Be Referred To As The "mississippi Veterans Affairs"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Veterans Affairs Board; authorize to be referred to as the "Mississippi Veterans Affairs".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed |
2019-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To MA |
2019-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: MA To AP |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Military Affairs;Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDP: VM To AP |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Appropriations |