MS SB2828 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Provision Stating That Nothing Shall Be Construed As Granting Agents And Inspectors Of The Alcoholic Beverage Control Division Of The Department Of Revenue General Police Powers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control Division; remove provision that agents and inspectors do not have general police powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Finance |