MS SB2826 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 43-21-121 And 9-5-89, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Authority Of The Youth And Chancery Courts To Appoint A Layperson Special Advocate And To Set Forth Minimum Qualifications For A Person To Serve In That Capacity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Court-appointed special advocates; clarify court's authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |