MS SB2822 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "mississippi Municipality And County Water Infrastructure Grant Program Act Of 2022" Administered By The Mississippi Department Of Environmental Quality Utilizing Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Funds Made Available Under The Federal American Rescue Plan Act (arpa); To Provide That Such Grants Shall Be Made Available To Municipalities, Counties And Certain Utilities On A One-to-one Matching Basis And To Provide An Additional Grant To Smaller Municipalities Based On Coronavirus Local Fiscal Recovery Funds; To Prescribe Eligible Projects Under The Grant Program; To Authorize Multiple Rounds Of Water, Wastewater, And Stormwater Infrastructure Grant Projects; To Authorize The Department Of Environmental Quality To Promulgate Grant Application Regulations And Engineering Assistance; To Authorize The Department Of Environmental Quality To Administer The Mcwi Grant Program And Retain Administrative Costs; To Exempt Deq From The Administrative Procedures Law In Promulgating Requirements For Grant Applications And From Oversight By The Public Procurement Review Board When Entering Into Necessary Contracts For Professional Services; To Provide That A Utility May Not Deny Water Service Solely On The Basis That The Customer Is A Medical Marijuana Licensee; To Amend Section 27-104-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Municipality and County Water Infrastructure Grant Program Act of 2022"; establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-05 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-04-04 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-04-04 | House | Reconsidered |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Michel |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |