MS SB2811 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration, Acting On Behalf Of The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, To Sell And Convey Certain State-owned Real Property And Any Improvements Thereon Under The Possession And Control Of The University Of Southern Mississippi, Located In Jackson County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
University of Southern Mississippi property; authorize DFA to sell and convey.
Sponsors
Sen. John Polk [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2013-03-01 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Public Property |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges |