MS SB2811 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-21-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Access To The Prescription Monitoring Program Of The State Board Of Pharmacy And Make Certain Technical Corrections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Prescription monitoring program; clarify access to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-21 | Conferees Named Holland,Read,Howell | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Tollison,Albritton,Baria | |
2011-03-14 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-09 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-03-01 | DR - TSDPAA: WM To PH | |
2011-02-22 | DR - TSDPAA: PH To WM | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Ways and Means | |
2011-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-09 | Passed | |
2011-02-09 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |