MS SB2804 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Section In Title 67, Chapter 1, Mississippi Code To 1972, To Create A Delivery Service Permit To Allow The Holder To Contract For The Delivery Of Alcoholic Beverages, Beer, Light Wine Or Light Spirit Product From A Licensed Retailer To A Consumer; To Allow A Licensed Retailer To Deliver Alcoholic Beverages, Beer, Light Wine Or Light Spirit Product To A Consumer If The Retailer Also Holds A Delivery Service Permit; To Specify Conditions Of Delivery Pursuant To The Permit; To Set Out Application Requirements For The Permit; To Specify The Enforcement Powers Of The Alcoholic Beverage Control Division Of The Department Of Revenue; To Amend Section 67-1-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include The Delivery Service Permit Among The Alcohol Permits Issued By The Department Of Revenue; To Provide That The Holder Of A Package Retailer's Permit Under Section 67-1-51 Or Of A Beer, Light Wine And Light Spirit Product Permit Under Section 67-3-19 Is Authorized To Apply For A Delivery Service Permit As A Privilege Separate From Its Existing Retail Permit; To Amend Sections 67-1-37, 67-1-83, 67-3-5, 67-3-25 And 27-71-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Above; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverage; create delivery service permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Steverson, Hines) |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 71 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 3 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |