MS SB2801 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Correct Paragraph References Regarding Certain Sales Tax Revenue That Is Required To Be Deposited, Without Diversion, Into The Telecommunications Ad Valorem Tax Reduction Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; correct a reference regarding diversion to the Telecommunications Ad Valorem Tax Reduction Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-10 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-03 | Passed | |
2011-02-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Ways and Means | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Finance |