MS SB2799 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Returned For Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Relating To Appointments To State Boards And Commissions And Agency Director Positions By Public Officials Which Require Senate Confirmation; To Amend Section 7-1-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise And Standardize Terms Of Office, Procedures For Filling Vacancies And The Responsibilities Of The Secretary Of State Regarding Said Appointments; To Amend Sections 43-28-7, 73-33-3, 73-33-5, 49-15-301, 49-15-305, 69-15-2, 73-1-5, 73-1-11, 39-11-1, 39-11-5, 75-75-103, 73-4-7, 73-4-11, 37-169-3, 73-75-7, 81-1-61, 81-3-12, 73-5-1, 73-5-3, 43-3-103, 39-27-1, 31-13-1, 57-10-167, 29-5-213, 37-28-7, 73-6-3, 73-6-5, 39-5-91, 37-155-7, 65-1-46, 19-5-333, 37-4-3, 31-3-3, 31-3-11, 69-44-3, 47-5-8, 73-7-1, 73-7-3, 73-30-5, 73-30-7, 45-39-3, 73-9-7, 73-9-13, 43-26-1, 57-1-5, 43-13-107, 37-1-1, 37-63-3, 37-63-7, 69-7-253, 73-69-21, 33-15-7, 41-59-7, 71-5-107, 73-13-5, 73-13-15, 49-2-4, 49-2-5, 25-4-5, 69-5-1, 27-104-101, 73-36-9, 49-19-1, 49-19-3, 73-11-43, 73-11-49, 75-76-9, 75-76-15, 73-63-9, 73-63-19, 55-15-21, 59-7-407, 59-5-21, 59-11-3, 61-3-7, 25-15-303, 41-3-1.1, 41-3-5.1, 43-33-704, 43-33-707, 41-73-7, 43-1-2, 25-53-7, 25-53-19, 73-73-23, 45-4-3, 69-46-3, 73-2-13, 45-6-5, 39-3-101, 27-115-9, 27-115-11, 73-67-9, 73-43-3, 41-4-3, 41-4-7, 63-17-57, 63-17-67, 73-17-7, 73-15-9, 73-15-17, 53-1-5, 73-19-7, 73-19-9, 47-7-5, 51-15-1, 69-48-3, 51-9-1, 25-9-109, 25-9-119, 73-21-75, 73-21-79, 73-23-41, 73-23-43, 73-29-7, 37-106-9, 73-31-5, 73-31-7, 25-11-15, 27-104-7, 45-1-2, 51-35-317, 73-34-7, 73-34-9, 73-35-5, 37-33-155, 37-33-159, 25-58-21, 73-59-21, 27-3-1, 69-10-2, 55-5-53, 49-17-45, 25-43-4.103, 73-53-8, 69-9-3, 65-9-9, 27-4-1, 51-27-1, 41-113-9, 51-13-105, 11-46-18, 77-13-29, 49-17-422, 7-1-501, 7-1-503, 35-1-1, 35-1-3, 35-7-7, 73-39-55, 43-55-5, 35-3-24, 59-7-125, 49-4-4, 49-4-6, 83-34-7, 43-59-3, 71-3-85, 37-153-7, 59-17-23 And 77-19-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Procedures And Terms Of Office For The Appointments Of Members To Certain State Boards, Agencies, And Other Government Entities And Authorities Which Require Senate Confirmation; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public official appointments; revise terms of office and appointment procedures on certain state boards, districts and agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 77 N: 30 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-10HouseReturned For Concurrence
2024-04-10HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2024-04-09HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Hines, Zuber, Johnson)
2024-04-09HousePassed As Amended
2024-04-09HouseAmended
2024-04-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2024-03-18HouseReferred To State Affairs
2024-03-15SenateTransmitted To House
2024-03-14SenatePassed
2024-03-14SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2024-02-29SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2024-02-19SenateReferred To Government Structure

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
114618Amended CodeSee Bill Text
195333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
251115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2515303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25434Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25537Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259119Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27104101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
271047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2711511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
271159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
295213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35324Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3577Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
371069Amended CodeSee Bill Text
371537Amended CodeSee Bill Text
371557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
371693Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37287Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3733155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3733159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3743Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37633Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37637Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41597Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41737Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4313107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43287Amended CodeSee Bill Text
433103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4333704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4333707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43593Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4543Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4758Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4775Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4915301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4915305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4917422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4944Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4946Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5113105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5135317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55553Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5710167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
591723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631757Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631767Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65146Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6599Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69443Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69483Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
697253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6993Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
715107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
731143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
731149Amended CodeSee Bill Text
731315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
731517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732179Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732343Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73297Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73349Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73369Amended CodeSee Bill Text
733955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73538Amended CodeSee Bill Text
735921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7363Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7365Amended CodeSee Bill Text
736319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73639Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73679Amended CodeSee Bill Text
736921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7373Amended CodeSee Bill Text
737323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73757Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7575103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
757615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
75769Amended CodeSee Bill Text
771329Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83347Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback