MS SB2798 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide For Certain Participation Of Rate-regulated Electric Utilities In The Expansion Of Broadband Services In The State Of Mississippi; To Amend Section 77-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Declare That It Is The Policy Of The State Of Mississippi To Support Expansion Of Existing And Emerging Technologies To Foster Reliable And Resilient Service And Customer Access To Enhanced Services; To Amend Section 77-3-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Definitions Of "broadband Service Provider," "broadband Operator" And "electric Delivery System"; To Amend Section 77-3-44, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Fiber-optic Infrastructure As An Economic Development Activity, To Allow Rate-regulated Electric Utilities To Permit Broadband Providers Use Of The Electric Delivery System To Provide Broadband Services, To Regulate Easements, To Allow Certain Entities To Construct Fiber-optic Infrastructure On Public Utilities' Existing Rights-of-way; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities; authorize rate-regulated electric utilities to permit broadband provider use of the electric delivery system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22 Approved by Governor
2021-04-05HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-04-05SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-29HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-29SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-22HouseConferees Named Bounds,Anderson (122nd),Gibbs (36th)
2021-03-16SenateConferees Named Carter,Parks,Polk
2021-03-12SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-11HouseReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-10HousePassed As Amended
2021-03-10HouseAmended
2021-03-08HouseRead the Third Time
2021-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Public Utilities
2021-02-04SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-03SenatePassed
2021-02-03SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Energy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77344Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/SB/SB2798.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2798IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2798CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2798PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2798SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/ham/SB2798_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/ham/SB2798_H_Amend_01_to_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0300039.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0650002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0850020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0850027.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback