MS SB2795 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration, Acting On Behalf Of The Department Of Revenue, To Purchase Certain Real Property Also Known As The "landmark Center" Located At 175 East Capitol Street In The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi, To Function As The Department Of Revenue's New Headquarters; To Amend Section 1, Chapter 480, Laws Of 2011, To Remove The Authority To Issue State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $3,000,000.00 For Equipping Of A New Headquarters Building For The Department Of Revenue To Be Located In The City Of Jackson, Mississippi, At A Site Selected By The Department Of Finance And Administration; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Revenue; authorize Department of Finance and Administration to purchase property for DOR's headquarters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Referred To Public Property;Appropriations | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-14 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-29 | DR - TSDPCS: PP To FI | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Public Property;Finance |