MS SB2793 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create Section 63-3-217, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Texting While Driving; To Define Certain Terms; To Provide Exemptions; To Amend Section 63-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Punishment For Driving Without A License; To Repeal Section 63-1-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Prohibits Texting While Driving By The Holders Of Temporary And Intermediate Licenses; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Driving; prohibit texting and revise punishment for no license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Died In Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Recommitted to Committee | |
2011-03-04 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-03-01 | DR - TSDPAA: AP To JB | |
2011-02-17 | DR - TSDPAA: JB To AP | |
2011-02-09 | Referred To Judiciary B;Appropriations | |
2011-02-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-03 | Amended | |
2011-01-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |