MS SB2792 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Energy Sustainability And Development Act"; To Amend Section 57-39-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Wherever The Word "division" Appears In The Chapter Of Law Which Provides For Energy Planning, It Shall Mean The Mississippi Development Authority Energy And Natural Resources Division; To Amend Section 57-39-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Powers And Duties Of The Division; To Amend Section 57-39-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Contents Of The Mississippi Energy Plan; To Amend Section 57-39-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Division To Coordinate The Development And Implementation Of A State Energy Management Plan For State-owned And Operated Facilities In Conjunction With The Department Of Finance And Administration; To Amend Section 57-39-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Purpose For Which Monies In The Energy Development Fund May Be Used And To Provide That The Division Will Administer The Fund; To Amend Section 57-39-112, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Division's Duties In Assisting The Public School Districts In Reducing Energy Consumption; To Create A New Section To Require The Division To Be Responsible For Compiling Data Related To The Energy Resources, Both Natural And Manmade, Of The State Of Mississippi; To Repeal Section 57-39-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Submission Of The Mississippi Energy Plan To The Legislature; To Repeal Section 57-39-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Additional Programs And Activities Of The Board Of Energy And Transportation; To Repeal Section 57-39-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For Limitations On Disclosure Of Propriety Information; To Repeal Section 57-39-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Criminal Penalties For The Failure To Submit Certain Information; To Repeal Section 57-39-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Board Of Energy And Transportation To Prescribe Policies As To Energy Efficiency And Allocation Of Petroleum Products; To Repeal Section 57-39-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Designates The Board As The State Office Of Petroleum Allocation; To Repeal Section 57-39-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Board Of Energy And Transportation To Administer The State Set-aside Program; To Repeal Section 57-39-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides The Board With Sole Authority To Establish Priorities Among Users And Consumers Of Allocated Products; To Repeal Section 57-39-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Prohibits The Establishment Of Priorities By Local Government Or Supplier Without Board Approval; To Repeal Section 57-39-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Board To Prepare A Plan For Establishing A Central Motor Pool; To Repeal Section 57-39-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Department Of Economic And Community Development To Develop And Implement A General Energy Management Plan; To Repeal Section 57-39-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Department Of Finance And Administration To Submit Data Regarding Energy Consumption; To Repeal Section 57-39-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires State Agencies To Submit Energy Management Plans; To Repeal Section 57-39-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Allows For A Smaller Percentage Reduction Goal For Qualifying Agencies; To Repeal Section 57-39-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires An Annual Report On Energy Reduction Programs; To Repeal Section 57-39-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes Loans For School Energy Conservation Programs; To Repeal Section 57-39-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Describes The Process For Approval Of Loans And Repayment; To Repeal Section 57-39-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Allows For The Forfeiture Of Homestead Exemption In The Case Of A Loan Default; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Energy Sustainability and Development Act"; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Burton,Polk,Browning |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-01 | House | Amended |
2013-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Energy |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Energy |