MS SB2791 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Section 25-3-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 25-3-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 25-3-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 25-9-133, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 37-3-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-5-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-5-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 57-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 65-1-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 81-1-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 25-9-147, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 25-3-34, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Salaries of public officers; bring forward various laws relating to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 3 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 9 | 133 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 9 | 147 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 3 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 1 | 69 | New Code | See Bill Text |