MS SB2791 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Planning And Implementation Of The State's Information Technology Resources By The Mississippi Department Of Information Technology Services (mdits); To Amend Section 25-53-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Direct The Department Of Information Technology Services To Manage One Or More State Data Centers; To Direct The Authority To Identify Opportunities For Consolidation Of Computer Hardware And Software And Use Virtualization Technology To Optimize The Number Of Machines And Environmentally Controlled Facilities; To Direct Mdits To Optimize The Shared Technology Components Of The State; To Direct Mdits To Increase Federal Participation In The State Data Center And Its Shared Technology Infrastructure; To Direct Mdits To Expand Online Services To Citizens, Businesses And Other Governmental Entities; To Direct State Agencies And Institutions To Give Their Full Cooperation And Assistance In The Successful Achievement Of These Efforts; To Direct Mdits To Report Progress In Its Annual Report To The Legislature; To Codify Section 25-53-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Applicability Of The State Data Center Operated By Mdits; To Authorize And Direct Mdits To Develop A Strategic Plan For The Consolidation Of Information Resources For All State Agencies At The State Data Center; To Require Certain State Agencies To Comply With The Plan For Consolidating Identified Operations To Be Performed Through The State Data Center; To Authorize The State Data Center To Issue A Timetable For Selected State Agencies To Enter Into Interagency Agreements For The Provision Of Information Services By The State Data Center; To Provide For The Transfer Of Ownership Of Information Resources Pursuant To The Interagency Agreement; To Authorize The State Data Center To Set And Charge Fees For Information Technology Services; To Authorize Mdits To Issue Rules And Regulations To Implement This Act; To Amend Section 25-53-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Each Member Of The Information Technology Services Board Shall Continue To Serve After The Expiration Of His Term Until His Successor Is Duly Appointed; To Amend Sections 25-53-1, 25-53-3, 25-53-25 And 31-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Bring Forward Section 25-53-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Relating To Telecommunications Services To State Agencies; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State agency information technology services; authorize Mississippi Department of Information Technology Services to consolidate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-07 | Passed | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-27 | DR - TSDPCS: FS To AP | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Fees, Salaries and Administration;Appropriations |