MS SB2788 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Olive Branch, Mississippi, To Contract For Naming Rights For The City's Park Buildings And Structures; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Olive Branch; authorize contracts for naming rights for the city's park buildings and structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-16 | House | Amended |
2015-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |