MS SB2783 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-15-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commission On Marine Resources To Re-designate Natural/public Reefs And Establish A Regulatory Program For The Purpose Of Private Leases; To Limit The Amount Of Reefs That May Be Placed Under A Private Lease; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on Marine Resources; authorize to re-designate natural/public reefs and establish program for private leases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateDied On Calendar
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseRead the Third Time
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-05HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To MR
2019-02-27HouseDR - TSDPAA: MR To AP
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Marine Resources;Appropriations
2019-02-13SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-12SenatePassed
2019-02-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-30SenateDR - TSDPCS: PI To AP
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Ports and Marine Resources;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback