MS SB2781 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "fresh Start Act Of 2019"; To Provide That No Person Shall Be Disqualified From Pursuing, Practicing Or Engaging In Any Occupation For Which A License Is Required Solely Or In Part Because Of A Prior Conviction Of A Crime, Unless The Crime For Which The Person Was Convicted Directly Relates To The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Licensed Occupation; To Prohibit The Use Of Vague Terms Such As "moral Turpitude," "good Character" And "any Felony"; To Provide That When Promulgating Rules And Regulations Related To The Qualifications For Licensure, Licensing Authorities Shall Only Consider Criminal Records That Are Specific And Directly Related To The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Licensed Occupation; To Establish A Clear And Convincing Standard Of Proof When Determining Whether A Person Will Be Denied A License; To Authorize A Person With A Criminal Record To Petition A Licensing Authority At Any Time For A Determination Of Whether The Person's Criminal Record Will Disqualify That Person From Obtaining A License; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Fresh Start Act; create to require the revision of licensing restrictions based on criminal records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Failed (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Approved by Governor
2019-04-03HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-28HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2019-03-28HouseReconsidered
2019-03-28HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Baker, Tullos)
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-28SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2019-03-28SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Failed
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-25HouseConferees Named Baker,Reynolds,Lamar
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Polk,Blackwell,Turner-Ford
2019-03-22SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseRead the Third Time
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2019-02-13SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-12SenatePassed
2019-02-12SenateAmendment Failed
2019-02-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2781.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2781IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2781CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2781PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2781SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2781_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2781_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2781_H_Amend_01_to_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2781_H_Amend_02_to_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2781_H_Amend_03_to_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0360039.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0650022.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0800016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0800020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0810004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0810004.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback