MS SB2780 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A Lien In Favor Of Providers Of Burn Care; To Provide The Procedure To Perfect The Lien; To Provide For The Filing Of The Lien; To Provide Address Releases And Covenants Not To Sue; To Provide That This Act Is Not Applicable To Funds Due Under The Workers' Compensation Law; To Address Settlements And Releases Entered Into Before Entering A Facility Providing Burn Care; To Provide That This Act Does Not Provide An Independent Right Of Action; To Provide That Giving A False Affidavit Shall Be Perjury; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Lien in favor of providers of burn care; create.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Motion to Concur Failed (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 93 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Motion to Concur Failed (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 93 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Smith (39th),Brown (20th) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Harkins,Horhn |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Concur Failed |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Clark, Mims, Barker) |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |