MS SB2778 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-351, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Conditions By Which A State Agency May Provide A Recipient Entity Pass-through Funding Under The Line-item Appropriation Transparency Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Line-Item Appropriation Transparency Act; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |