MS SB2776 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-103-159, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Each State Agency To Include A Summary Of Any Maintenance Of Effort (moe) Or Memoranda Of Understanding (mou) Agreements Or Contracts Entered Into With Any Federal Agency With Its Annual Budget Request Presentation To The Legislative Budget Office; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State agency budget information to be submitted to LBO & posted on website; include MOE/MOU agreements & fed. contract information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |