MS SB2770 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Teacher Salary Scale By Increasing The Minimum Salary By $1,500.00; To Amend Section 37-21-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Minimum Annual Salary For Teacher Assistants; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers' salaries; provide for $1,500.00 increase.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 95 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Motion to Recommit Lost (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Approved by Governor
2019-04-03HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateMotion to Recommit Lost
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-27HouseConferees Named Bennett,Roberson,Read
2019-03-27SenateConferees Named Tollison,Clarke,Caughman
2019-03-19SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-13HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-12HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Harness, Sykes, Bennett, Roberson)
2019-03-11HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-11HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-05HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To ED
2019-03-04HouseDR - TSDPAA: ED To AP
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Education;Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-13SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-13SenateAmended
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2770.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2770IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2770PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2770SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2770_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2770_S_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2770_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2770_H_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0370016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0630013.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0800003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0800017.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0800023.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback