MS SB2767 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Secretary Of State To Conduct A Study To Determine The Cost And Feasibility Of A System That Would Allow Citizens Of This State To Register To Vote And Update Their Voter Registration Information Online Through A Secure Internet Web Site; To Provide That The Secretary Of State Shall Develop And Submit A Report Of His Findings To The Chairman Of The Elections Committee Of The Senate And The Chairman Of The Apportionment And Elections Committee Of The House Of Representatives; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Online voter registration; require the Secretary of State to study and report on the cost and feasibility of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Apportionment and Elections | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Elections |