MS SB2754 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That It Is Unlawful To Knowingly Create, Design, Manufacture, Sell, Purchase, Lease, Install, Update, Repair, Service, Transfer, Use, Or Possess Or Otherwise Make Available Automated Sales Suppression Devices Or Other Devices Or Programs That Can Be Used To Falsify Or Manipulate Cash Registers And Other Forms Of Point-of-sale Systems And Records; To Define Certain Terms For The Purposes Of This Act; To Provide Penalties For Violations Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Automated sales suppression devices; prohibit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2018-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Read the Third Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |