MS SB2753 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Payment Of Certain State Income Tax Liability In Installments Over A Period Of Not To Exceed 60 Months If The Amount Of The Tax Liability Is In Excess Of $3,000.00 And The Taxpayer Has Entered Into An Installment Agreement With The Internal Revenue Service To Pay Federal Income Taxes On Income Earned During The Same Taxable Year During Which The State Income Tax Liability Was Incurred; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; authorize payment of certain large tax liabilities in monthly installments over 60 months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Ways and Means | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-01-21 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Finance |