MS SB2727 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
Pending: House Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-7-31.5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That The Transportation Of Wild Hogs In The State Of Mississippi Is A Class I Violation; To Amend Section 49-7-140, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Authority Of The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Issue Permits For The Transportation Of Feral Hogs, Live Swine Or Russian Boars; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wild hogs; clarify designation of Class I violation for transportation of, and eliminate permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
2020-03-11SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-10SenatePassed
2020-03-10SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-02-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback