MS SB2725 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize And Legalize The Cultivation, Processing And Transportation Of Hemp; To Define Certain Terms; To Develop A State Plan To Monitor And Regulate The Cultivation, Transportation And Processing Of Hemp In This State And Comply With All Federal Laws And United States Department Of Agriculture Plans; To Require The Licensing And/or Registration Of Hemp Growers And Processors By The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Commerce; To Require Record Keeping And Inspections; To Provide For Fees For Licensing And/or Registration Process; To Provide For The Revocation Of Licenses And/or Registration And Imposition Of Civil Penalties For Violations Of This Act; To Require Persons Growing Or Processing Hemp To Give Bond To The Commissioner Of Agriculture And Commerce As A Condition Of Licensure; To Authorize The Commissioner To Establish The Amount Of The Bond, And To Promulgate Any Rules And Regulations For The Issuance Of Such Bonds And In Compliance With Any Federal Law Or Regulation; To Amend Sections 69-25-51, 41-29-113, 41-29-105 And 41-29-136, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hemp; create the Mississippi Hemp Cultivation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Failed to Concur (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Failed to Concur (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider W/Drawn |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Failed to Concur |
2020-06-16 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-12 | House | Amended |
2020-06-08 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred To Agriculture |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture |