MS SB2713 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Process Reimbursement For Each Component Of National Board Certification For Teachers; To Authorize And Provide For A Salary Supplement Pilot Program For National Board Certified Teachers Employed In A Public School District Located In Certain Counties; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Salary supplement for Nat'l. Bd. Certified teachers who teach in certain counties; authorize & clarify process reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Died In Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-17 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |