MS SB2710 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Prohibit A State Agency, Department, Political Subdivision Of This State, County, Municipality, University, College, Community College Or Junior College, Or Any Agent, Employee Or Officer Thereof From Creating, Planning, Implementing, Assisting, Participating In, Or Enabling A Sanctuary Policy; To Provide That Any Sanctuary Policy Adopted In Violation Of This Act Shall Be Invalid And Void From The Date Of Its Adoption Or Enactment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanctuary cities; prohibit adoption or enactment of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 76 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27 Approved by Governor
2017-03-22HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-22SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-21SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2017-03-08HouseReturned For Concurrence
2017-03-07HousePassed As Amended
2017-03-07HouseAmended
2017-03-02HouseRead the Third Time
2017-02-23HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2017-02-21HouseReferred To Judiciary B
2017-02-13SenateTransmitted To House
2017-02-13SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2017-02-09SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2017-02-09SenatePassed
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2017-01-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2017-01-16SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/SB/SB2710.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2710IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2710CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2710PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2710SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/SB2710_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0380018.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0420003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0640007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0780005.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback