MS SB2702 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-943, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer All Of The Rights, Benefits, Obligations And Duties Of The Walnut Grove Correctional Authority To The Mississippi Department Of Corrections; To Repeal Chapter 991, Laws Of 1998, Which Creates The Walnut Grove Correctional Authority And Provide For Its Powers And Duties; To Repeal Chapter 906, Laws Of 2013, Which Authorizes Members Of The Board Of Commissioners Of The Walnut Grove Correctional Authority To Receive Per Diem Compensation; To Repeal Chapter 913, Laws Of 2019, Which Authorizes The Walnut Grove Correctional Authority To House Prisoners Who Have Been Classified To Any Custody Level; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Walnut Grove Correctional Authority; transfer all rights, benefits, obligations and duties to Dept. of Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Corrections;Appropriations |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |