MS SB2700 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 1 Through 21, Chapter 522, Laws Of 2002, As Amended By Section 10, Chapter 431, Laws Of 2011, To Authorize Funds In The Deer Island Acquisition, Reclamation And Preservation Fund To Be Utilized For The Acquisition, Reclamation And Preservation Of Cat Island; To Revise The Time Within Which The Secretary Of State Must Make An Accounting Of Unused Bond Proceeds Issued Under The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Deer Island Acquisition, Reclamation and Preservation Fund; authorize funds to be utilized for acquisition of Cat Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-03-05 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To PP |
2013-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: PP To WM |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Public Property;Ways and Means |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |