MS SB2699 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-27-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Procedures For The Removal Of Derelict Vessels; To Provide That Certain Proceeds Escheat To The State; To Require Inquiry With The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks Before Disposal; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Derelict vessels on the coastal wetlands; revise procedure for the removal of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-16 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Eure,Crawford,Barnett |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conferees Named Gollott,Tindell,Burton |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-28 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-24 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Eure, Crawford) |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-24 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |