MS SB2695 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A Pilot Program For The Equal Opportunity For Students With Special Needs Act For The Purpose Of Establishing Education Scholarship Accounts (esa) For Parents Of Eligible Students With Special Needs On A Phased-in Basis; To Prescribe The Criteria For Determining Eligibility For Participation In The Program And Receipt Of Program Funds; To Provide For The Funding Of Each Student's Esa; To Stipulate The Obligations Of Parents Or Legal Guardians, Students And Schools To Become And Remain Eligible For Participation; To Prescribe The Duties Of The Department Of Education Regarding The Administration Of The Funds; To Provide For The Issuance Of Esa Procurement Cards; To Require Peer To Prepare A Biannual Report On The Sufficiency Of Funding For Esas And Student Performance And Assessment Evaluation Beginning In 2018 And Every Two Years Thereafter; To Provide For The Administrative, Financial And Academic Accountability Standards To Be Adhered To By Participating Schools; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Equal Opportunity for Students with Special Needs" program to establish ESAs for certain students; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 65 N: 51 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 65 N: 51 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2015-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (66th), Moore, Clarke) |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Education |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Education |