MS SB2690 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 13-7-1, 13-7-3, 13-7-5, 13-7-7, 13-7-9, 13-7-11, 13-7-13, 13-7-15, 13-7-17, 13-7-19, 13-7-21, 13-7-23, 13-7-25, 13-7-27, 13-7-29, 13-7-31, 13-7-33, 13-7-35, 13-7-37, 13-7-39, 13-7-41, 13-7-43, 13-7-45, 13-7-47 And 13-7-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The State Grand Jury Act And Provide For The Operation Of A State Grand Jury; To Amend Section 99-11-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Repeal Date On Venue For Indictments By The State Grand Jury; To Amend Section 27, Chapter 553, Laws Of 1993, As Amended By Chapter 382, Laws Of 1998, As Amended By Chapter 480, Laws Of 1999, As Amended By Chapter 471, Laws Of 2002, As Amended By Chapter 506, Laws Of 2005, To Delete The Repeal Date On The State Grand Jury Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Grand Jury Act; delete repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Died On Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-02-18 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-02-17 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-17 | Amended | |
2011-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |