MS SB2685 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 87-11-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Noncompete Agreements In Physician Contracts; To Define Terms; To Create Exceptions; To Provide For Reimbursement By The Terminated Physician In Some Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Physician contracts; prohibit noncompete clauses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Failed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Amended |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-24 | Senate | DR - TSDP: PH To JA |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Judiciary, Division A |