MS SB2680 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 19-25-74, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A County Sheriff To Record On An Annual Basis Certain Information Related To Meals Served To Prisoners In The Custody Of The County Jail; And For Related Purposes.
Title
County sheriffs; revise recordkeeping requirements for meals served to prisoners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Amended |
2020-06-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |