MS SB2675 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 93-21-101, 93-21-103, 93-21-107, 93-21-109 And 93-21-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purpose Of Amendment; To Amend Section 93-21-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Administrative Authority For Certain Domestic Violence Shelter Funding; To Create Section 93-21-119 Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Set Forth The Single State Agency Responsible For The Administration Of Certain Federal Grants; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Domestic violence shelters; bring forward sections and revise administration of certain funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Died In Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B;Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-02-03 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: AC To JB |
2014-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: JB To AC |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |